Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Age of Majority - Right to Parental Support and Maintenance
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a certain individual who is continuously enrolled in school, including a secondary school, postsecondary school, or vocational training program, has the right to receive parental support and maintenance until a certain occurrence or until the individual attains the age of 21.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - General Provisions - Age of Majority - Right to Parental Support and Maintenance
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM