Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release
Sponsored by
Chair, Anne Arundel County Senators (By Request - County Executive)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, in Anne Arundel County, a law enforcement agency to retain, donate, or dispose of certain personal property under certain circumstances; and providing that if certain property is retained or donated, the certificate of the local law enforcement agency that the personal property has been retained or donated is sufficient evidence of title for certain purposes.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0429
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM