Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regulated Firearms - Database - Applications for Dealer's License - Record Keeping and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Raskin, Conway, Ferguson, Forehand, Gladden, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police or the Secretary's designee to disapprove an application for a State-regulated firearms dealer's license if the Secretary or designee determines that the applicant intends a person who is not eligible to be issued a dealer's license or whose dealer's license has been revoked or suspended to participate or hold a specified interest in the management or operation of the business for which the license is sought; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0375
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-110, 5-114, 5-115, 5-144 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM