Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Jennings, and Waugh
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring a court to order a person convicted of poaching deer on any land in the State to pay the State specified restitution and to perform 40 to 80 hours of community service under specified circumstances; requiring the restitution collected under the provisions of the Act to be credited to the State Wildlife Management and Protection Fund; encouraging the Department of Natural Resources in cooperation with local law enforcement agencies to develop time-sensitive approaches to investigating reports of deer poaching; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0410
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874438/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/29 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {103025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690011/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-3)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {874438/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Special Order until 2/29 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 31
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted 35
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted 36
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {103025/1 Adopted 36
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 38
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 40
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {690011/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate McCray) Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-3) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-1101.1, 10-1102, 10-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM