Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, McFadden, Ramirez, Robinson, Young, Astle, Feldman, Jennings, Hershey, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, the Maternal and Child Health Bureau, the Vital Statistics Administration, and interested stakeholders, to conduct a study on the mortality rates of African American infants and infants in rural areas; requiring the Commission to examine certain factors; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations, including draft legislation establishing a council on infant mortality, by November 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0716
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {577176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {577176/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {566086/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM