Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the owner or operator of a parking lot used by a continuing care retirement community to limit the amount of time that a motor vehicle is authorized to be parked in any parking space designated for the use of individuals with disabilities; prohibiting the owner or operator of a parking lot used by a continuing care retirement community from limiting the amount of time that a vehicle may be parked in a parking space designated for the use of individuals with disabilities to less than one-half hour; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1225
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 14
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM