Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Jennings, Norman, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Ready, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Abolishing the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing for the transfer of property, assets, licenses, credits, and rights of the Baltimore City Detention Center to the Mayor of Baltimore City; requiring the State to pay all the operating and capital costs of the Baltimore City Detention Center in fiscal years 2016 through 2018, one-half the costs in 2019, and providing that Baltimore City pay all the operating and capital costs in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015, January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {308571/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {308571/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Proceedings
39
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {308571/1 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 34
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {308571/1 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin) 39
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-304, 10-701, 10-801, 1-101, 11-101, 11-704, 5-101, 5-102, 5-201, 5-202, 5-203, 5-301, 5-302, 5-401 through 5-406, 9-106, 9-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM