Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an election judge to establish a voter's identity and verify the voter's address if the voter seeks to vote a regular ballot; requiring an election judge to qualify a voter by requesting the voter to present a current government-issued photo identification; requiring an election judge to authorize an individual to vote a regular ballot; allowing a voter who is unable to present a specified form of identification to vote by provisional ballot under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1017 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-310, 16-201 )
(   12-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM