Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Guzzone, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species; requiring the Department to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species on or before December 31, 2018, subject to available funding; prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a specified cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until July 1, 2019.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0211
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cownose Ray Fishing Tournaments - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {103824/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Tournaments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990715/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-23)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cownose Ray Fishing Tournaments - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 18
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted 19
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Floor Amendment {103824/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 19
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Text - Third - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Tournaments
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 25
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {990715/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (115-23) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text - Chapter - Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM