Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the list of crimes included within a certain definition of "crime of violence" to include sexual abuse of a minor if the victim is under the age of 16 instead of under the age of 13.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/20/2020
Legislative Date
8/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 8/20/2020 8/20/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page