Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Bates, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the relief that may be awarded in a final protective order to include any other relief that a judge determines is necessary to protect a person eligible for relief from abuse.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0225
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {678372/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {678372/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/26/2015 3/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM