Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Astle, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Mathias, Muse, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that prohibitions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine do not apply to emergency veterinary care for which a person may not be held civilly liable; providing immunity from civil liability for specified people providing emergency veterinary aid, care, or assistance to an animal where the owner or custodian is not available to grant permission under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0216
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {718574/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Text - Chapter - Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-313, 2-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM