Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified bonds, notes, or other obligations used for specified purposes in connection with specified school facilities in Baltimore City to be payable from revenues and receipts from a specified beverage container tax, from the proceeds, participation rent, and other fees payable by specified video lottery facilities, or from specified other revenues; authorizing specified revenues and receipts to be irrevocably pledged in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM