Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, Conway, Dyson, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Getty, Glassman, Hershey, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Rosapepe, Simonaire, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide mandatory training for specified individuals in addressing human trafficking; requiring the training to focus on specified issues; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to seek the input and participation of specified organizations in the preparation and presentation of the training.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0358
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM