Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the Internet
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, DeGrange, Kasemeyer, McFadden, Peters, and Robey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Lottery Agency from allowing a person to purchase a State lottery ticket through an electronic device that connects to the Internet.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {979331/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {979331/1 Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 35
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM