Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing the electronic smoking device retail license; altering the Clean Indoor Air Act to include a prohibition on electronic smoking devices and exhaled electronic smoking device vapor; altering the definition of "electronic smoking devices manufacturer" to limit the manner in which a manufacturer may sell electronic smoking devices to consumers; altering the definition of "vape shop vendor" to require that the vendor exclusively sell electronic smoking devices and related accessories to consumers in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:59 PM