Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - Establishment by Counties
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county to establish a minimum wage rate for employees working in the county; and altering the minimum wage that an employer is required to pay employees.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM