Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Mathias, Middleton, Serafini, Eckardt, Ferguson, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county from receiving specified revenues derived from a State forest or State park reserve and concession operations within a county if the county receives specified State payments in a fiscal year; requiring specified payments to counties for State forests, State parks, and wildlife management areas that are exempt from the property tax; providing for the calculation of the payment; clarifying when land is to be included in the specified calculation; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0263 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {969932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {490014/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {969932/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 47
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {490014/1 Adopted 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 69
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Text - Chapter - State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-801, 5-101, 5-212, 5-212.1 )
(   6.5-101 through 6.5-301, 6-102, 7-210, 7-211, 7-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM