Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Senators King, Currie, Edwards, Guzzone, Manno, Peters, Serafini, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for specified vehicles a special registration plate honoring retired law enforcement officers; specifying who may apply for and the classes of vehicles eligible for the special registration plate; specifying that to be eligible for a special registration plate an applicant must provide documentation from the a specified law enforcement agency certifying that the applicant retired from the law enforcement agency in good standing; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-619.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM