Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Astle, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland renewable energy portfolio standard program to include a specified amount of energy derived from offshore wind energy; prohibiting the portion of the renewable energy portfolio that represents offshore wind energy from applying to retail electricity sales by a supplier in excess of specified amounts of specified loads; defining "offshore wind renewable energy credit" for specified purposes; establishing an application process for specified proposed offshore wind energy projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0226
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-208, 7-701, 7-703, 7-704, 7-704.1, 7-704.2, 7-705 )
(   9-20C-01 through 9-20C-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM