Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the provision of law prohibiting in Carroll County the issuance of a permit authorizing the operation of a card game, card tournament, or casino event after 1 a.m. on Sunday.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0610
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Ways and Means 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
(   13-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page