Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable Income
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Benson, Currie, Miller, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "net taxable income" for purposes of calculating specified State aid formulas for education; requiring the Comptroller to certify annually the amount of net taxable income in a specified manner; requiring State aid for education to be paid in a specified manner under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM