Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from suspending, revoking, or denying the registration of a vehicle based solely on the vehicle owner's failure to have the vehicle inspected and tested as required under the Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM