Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage – Tax Increment Financing Developments – Application
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Rosapepe, Zucker, Middleton, and Benson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the prevailing wage law to apply to the construction of certain structures or works funded with certain bond proceeds and located in tax increment financing development districts created on or after July 1, 2018; providing that the prevailing wage law applies to the construction of certain structures or works only if authorized by a political subdivision, Baltimore City, or the Revenue Authority of Prince George's County; and applying the Act only to contracts executed on or after July 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0546
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717975/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-49)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Prevailing Wage – Tax Increment Financing Developments – Application
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {717975/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage – Tax Increment Financing Developments – Application
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-49) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Text - Chapter - Prevailing Wage – Tax Increment Financing Developments – Application
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM