Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Raskin, Benson, Conway, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, Young, Zirkin, Montgomery, Gladden, Kasemeyer, Jones-Rodwell, Manno, McFadden, Muse, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individual who applies to register to vote or update an existing voter registration online to provide specified information; providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to register to vote or update an existing voter registration address and vote during early voting; requiring proof of residency to register or update an existing voter registration address during early voting; specifying methods of requesting an absentee ballot, including through an accessible online application; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, January 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184239/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184239/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (38-7)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {664735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {743926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965060/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-37)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {184239/1 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments {184239/1 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (38-7) 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {664735/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29) 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {743926/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 45
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {965060/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-37) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1, 16-201, 3-204.1, 3-302, 3-305, 9-305, 9-306, 9-308.1, 9-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM