Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage Data
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an electric company from disclosing specified data to a third party, subject to specified exceptions; authorizing a customer to submit a specified complaint to the Public Service Commission under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to conduct a specified investigation following receipt of a complaint; authorizing the Commission to take specified actions; making an electric company liable for unauthorized disclosures of specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302.1, 7-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM