Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving specified projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of specified academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the University System of Maryland to issue bonds in a total principal amount of $7,500,000 to finance and refinance a bioengineering facility; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 11:45 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-5)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/05 at 11:45 a.m.
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Appropriations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-5) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM