Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bates, and Cassilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 7% to 8.5% the alcoholic content of hard cider that is part of the definition of beer used in the Alcoholic Beverages Article.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard Cider
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM