Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland Cybersecurity Council to include the State Administrator of Elections or the State Administrator's designee.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {144339/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {144339/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 33
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Economic Matters 34
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text - Chapter - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM