Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Pass-Through Entities
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax equal to the amount by which the tax, when applying a specified effective tax rate, on the individual's distributive share of pass-through entity income exceeds the tax on the individual's distributive share of pass-through entity income when applying a tax rate of 2.875%; providing that an individual may not claim the credit if the individual's effective tax rate is less than 2.875%; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1384 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM