Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Education)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring specified provisions of law relating to early childhood development from the Family Law Article to the Education Article; establishing the Division of Early Childhood Development within the State Department of Education; renaming the Early Childhood Development Advisory Council to be the Office of Child Care Advisory Council; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 11:45 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {643028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/05 at 11:45 a.m.
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {643028/1 Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1601 through 7-1608, 9.5-101 through 9.5-110, 9.5-301, 9.5-302, 9.5-303, 9.5-303 through 9.5-307, 9.5-304, 9.5-305, 9.5-306, 9.5-307, 9.5-308, 9.5-309, 9.5-310, 9.5-311, 9.5-312, 9.5-313, 9.5-314 through 9.5-321, 9.5-321, 9.5-401, 9.5-401 through 9.5-414, 9.5-403, 9.5-404, 9.5-405, 9.5-407, 9.5-410, 9.5-411, 9.5-412, 9.5-412 through 9.5-414, 9.5-414, 9.5-415 through 9.5-418, 9.5-417, 9.5-418, 9.5-419, 9.5-420, 9.5-501, 9.5-501 through 9.5-505, 9.5-502, 9.5-503, 9.5-504, 9.5-505, 9.5-601, 9.5-602, 9.5-602 through 9.5-609, 9.5-603, 9.5-604, 9.5-605, 9.5-606, 9.5-607, 9.5-608, 9.5-609, 9.5-701, 9.5-702, 9.5-702 through 9.5-707, 9.5-703, 9.5-704, 9.5-705, 9.5-706, 9.5-707, 9.5-801, 9.5-801 through 9.5-804, 9.5-802, 9.5-803 )
(   5-501, 5-508, 5-550, 5-550.1, 5-551, 5-551 through 5-554.1, 5-552, 5-553, 5-554, 5-554.1, 5-555, 5-556, 5-556.1, 5-557, 5-557.1, 5-558, 5-559, 5-559.1 through 5-559.8, 5-560 through 5-569, 5-570 through 5-580.3, 5-581 through 5-583.1, 5-584, 5-585, 5-586 through 5-589.1, 5-590 through 5-593, 5-594, 5-594.1 through 5-594.8, 5-595, 5-595.1 through 5-595.6, 5-705.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM