Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bates, and Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a reverse mortgage lender to establish an escrow account for the payment of property taxes and insurance; requiring the escrow account to be established in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring the escrow account to allow for monthly collection and deposit of funds; requiring a reverse mortgage lender to send specified notices; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM