Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agency Licensing - Exception for Passive Debt Buyers
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing a specified exception to a specified collection agency licensing requirement for a passive debt buyer under specified circumstances; prohibiting a specified judgment collected by a passive debt buyer from being considered presumptively invalid under specified circumstances; prohibiting a judgment entered before the effective date of the Act from being considered presumptively invalid under specified circumstances; and defining the term "passive debt buyer".
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM