Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - Occurrence
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Eckardt, Guzzone, Hough, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the occurrence of a specified promotional event established under the Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program in the Department of Agriculture to advocate State agriculture and farm products to children through school meal and classroom programs; and requiring the promotional event to be held once in the fall and once in the spring.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM