Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's and Renter's Insurance - Coverage for Dog Owners
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from refusing to issue or renew a policy of homeowner's or renter's insurance solely because the applicant or insured owns a dog, regardless of the breed of dog; prohibiting a policy of homeowner's or renter's insurance that provides liability coverage from excluding specified coverage arising out of contact with a dog under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0296 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM