Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person that obtains a highway work permit from the State Highway Administration to maintain pedestrian access at work sites that are within 2 miles of Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority rail services or transit stations or Maryland Transit Administration transit stations, including Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) stations; and requiring the State Highway Administration to adopt certain regulations governing pedestrian access in areas subject to a highway work permit.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-27)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {747372/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 47
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (106-27) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:16 AM