Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animals - Civil Liability and Insurance Coverage for Dogs and Court Costs for Animal-Related Crimes
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an owner, a keeper, or a harborer of a dog is liable for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog under specified circumstances; prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's or renter's insurance, from refusing to underwrite a risk or denying, canceling, or refusing to renew coverage solely because an applicant or insured owns, keeps, or harbors a specific breed of dog; requiring a specified additional cost to be imposed in specified criminal cases; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Finance 12
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM