Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the membership of employees of the Warrant Apprehension Unit in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; authorizing specified employees of the Warrant Apprehension Unit to transfer membership to the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System on or before December 31, 2015; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to transfer specified funds to the annuity savings fund of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0694
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {369930/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments {369930/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-201, 26-202, 26-203.1, 26-203.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM