Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Forehand
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to prohibit smoking a tobacco product at any time on the grounds of public school property; establishing penalties for violation of the Act; and defining "smoking".
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307672/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307672/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307672/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Forehand) {683326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {933823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-8)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307672/1 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307672/1 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307672/1 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Forehand) {683326/1 Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {933823/1 Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (32-8) 31
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 34
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM