Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Brochin, Cassilly, Gladden, Hough, Muse, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a State's Attorney to file a petition to freeze assets of a defendant charged with a specified financial crime involving a vulnerable or elder adult under specified circumstances; requiring that a petition to freeze assets be served in accordance with the Maryland Rules and include specified information; requiring that a petition to freeze assets be mailed to specified financial institutions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0737
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1371 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778572/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {778572/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM