Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Pollution Control - Penalty
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Ferguson, Glassman, Jennings, Montgomery, Reilly, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $5,000 to $10,000 a specified penalty for specified violations of the water pollution control law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0799
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) 33
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-342 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM