Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senator Dyson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to fiscal year 2030 the fiscal year through which the Governor is authorized to include an appropriation in the budget bill for the Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund; altering the manner in which disbursements of money appropriated to the Fund are required to be made; requiring that any money received by a regional council under a specified provision of law be used for a specified purpose; extending the termination date of the Fund to June 30, 2030; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM