Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that require the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the effect of competitive rating on the insurance markets in the State; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to continue to collect and analyze data relating to the competitiveness of specified insurance markets, to review and analyze information on the use of a specified factor in establishing specified rates, and to notify the Governor and the General Assembly of specified changes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Rate Making for Automobile Insurance - Reports
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {957173/1 Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Economic Matters 26
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-338, 11-339 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM