Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Brochin, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to take certain actions when serving as a representative payee or fiduciary for certain federal benefits for a child in the Department's custody; requiring the Department to provide certain notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of certain actions taken with respect to certain benefits for the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0524
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0442 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-15)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48B
Text - Third - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judiciary 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (120-15) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM