Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a provision in the declaration of a condominium or in a governing document of a homeowners association that requires any action on the part of a holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on a unit or a lot in order to make certain amendments shall be deemed satisfied if certain procedures are satisfied under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Text - Chapter - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:42 PM