Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a method for the election of judges to the circuit courts on a nonpartisan basis at a general election; providing that a candidate for election as judge of a circuit court may not be nominated at a primary election; providing that a candidate for election as judge of a circuit court may not be nominated to the ballot by a political party that is not required to nominate candidates by primary election; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-301, 5-303, 5-703, 5-703.1, 8-901 through 8-904, 9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM