Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to make available free, unlimited, potable drinking water for each student throughout the school day and to include a reusable water bottle on the school supplies list; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654437/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {654437/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) 41
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM