Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the maximum speed limit for all expressways and interstate highways that connect with Interstate 495 in the State be the same as for Interstate 495 at the point of connection for 5 miles from the point of entrance to or exit from Interstate 495; and requiring the State Highway Administration to post notice of the maximum speed limit for an expressway at no greater than 5-mile intervals.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0055 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/20/2020
Legislative Date
10/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/20/2020 10/20/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways
Last Updated: 1/25/2021 10:20 AM
Click to return on the top page