Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a refillable wine container permit in Harford County; authorizing the Harford County Liquor Control Board to issue a refillable container permit for wine to a holder of a specified license under specified circumstances and conditions; specifying that the Act applies in the County to wine; providing that the permit authorizes the permit holder to sell wine for off-premises consumption in a refillable container under specified circumstances and conditions; providing for an annual permit fee of $50; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {304734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243692/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {304734/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 38
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {243692/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 63
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 21-107, 8-103, 8-213.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM