Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, DeGrange, Guzzone, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including certain individuals employed by the Department of Juvenile Services and the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services in the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; requiring a certain transfer and combination of certain service credit for certain individuals; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to calculate a certain disability benefit for certain individuals and to grant a certain benefit under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {739735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {354668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {739735/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Reassigned to Appropriations 53
House 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {354668/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM